This case was last updated from Okaloosa County Courts on 06/28/2023 at 01:08:35 (UTC).

CRESTVIEW HOSPITAL CORPORATION vs. FLEMING, MAVERONICA

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 CRESTVIEW HOSPITAL CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FLEMING, MAVERONICA. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARD, JIM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************94 C

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARD, JIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRESTVIEW HOSPITAL CORPORATION

Defendant

FLEMING, MAVERONICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • HearingEvent: NOMC SP PRETRIAL; Judge: WARD, JIM; Location: Courtroom A; Result: CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketEntry: COURT RESULT: NOMC SP PRETRIAL SET FOR 06/26/2023 AT 9:30 AM - CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketEntry: STIPULATION & AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS SERVED: MAVERONICA FLEMING 6/10/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023022158

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: LOTANE, TROY R SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2023 SC 001194 C, CRESTVIEW HOSPITAL CORPORATION VS. FLEMING, MAVERONICA ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: CIVILSUMMONS-5/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED: MAVERONICA FLEMING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: NOMC SP PRETRIAL SET FOR 06/26/2023 AT 9:30 AM IN CRV/ , JDG: WARD, JIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS AS TO MAVERONICA FLEMING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT OF CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $3000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE WARD, JIM: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/26/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 SC 001194 C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less