This case was last updated from Okaloosa County Courts on 08/18/2020 at 18:22:56 (UTC).

CARDREON, NICOLE vs. HERNDON, JEFFREY DANIEL

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 CARDREON, NICOLE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HERNDON, JEFFREY DANIEL. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BROWN, JOHN T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 FV

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BROWN, JOHN T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARDREON, NICOLE

Respondent

HERNDON, JEFFREY DANIEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: EXHIBIT B TEXTING BETWEEN PARTIES AND PHOTOS ON THE PHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: EXHIBIT A TEXTING BETWEEN PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: EXHIBIT 1 TEXTING BETWEEN PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: CLERK'S EXHIBIT INVENTORY LIST FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION HRG; Judge: BROWN, JOHN T; Location: Courtroom 2B; Result: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION HRG; Judge: BROWN, JOHN T; Location: Courtroom 2B; Result: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: OCSO DOMESTIC VIOLENCE SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020 DR 001798 FV, CARDREON, NICOLE VS. HERNDON, JEFFREY DANIEL ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: ORD-7/2/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: COURT RESULT: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION HRG SET FOR 07/02/2020 AT 11:00 AM - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: OCSO DOMESTIC VIOLENCE SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020 DR 001798 FV, CARDREON, NICOLE VS. HERNDON, JEFFREY DANIEL ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: FJIU-7/2/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION & NOTICE OF HEARING: 7/2/20 @ 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: SHERIFF SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: FAMILY COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION HRG SET FOR 07/02/2020 AT 11:00 AM IN FWB/ , JDG: BROWN, JOHN T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE BROWN, JOHN T: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/19/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 DR 001798 FV

    Read MoreRead Less