This case was last updated from Okaloosa County Courts on 12/04/2022 at 02:25:47 (UTC).

APEX ROOFING & RESTORATION LLC vs. UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 09/28/2022 APEX ROOFING RESTORATION LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHLECHTER, JONATHAN V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************39 F

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHLECHTER, JONATHAN V

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

APEX ROOFING & RESTORATION LLC

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SACKS, JORDAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ACCEPTED BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION 10/3/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022038256

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: SACKS, JORDAN SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022 CC 002039 F, APEX ROOFING & RESTORATION LLC VS. UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: SIT-9/28/2022,OPR-9/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: ORDER TO PLAINTIFF RE REQUIRED REPORTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANTS DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST TO PRODUCE DIRECTED TO: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DIRECTED TO: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE PLAN FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SCHLECHTER, JONATHAN V: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/28/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CC 002039 F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APEX ROOFING AND RESTORATION LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR HAZLEY, CLARK AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR HAZLEY, DEBBIE is a litigant

Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SACKS , JORDAN