This case was last updated from Okaloosa County Courts on 08/13/2022 at 01:49:02 (UTC).

APEX ROOFING & RESTORATION LLC vs. UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 APEX ROOFING RESTORATION LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHLECHTER, JONATHAN V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************78 F

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHLECHTER, JONATHAN V

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

APEX ROOFING & RESTORATION LLC

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO DISMISS (DEF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEntry: AGREED ORDER ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (PLF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS SERVED: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION 7/6/2022 **ELECTRONIC DELIVERY**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022026242

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: MOHAMMAD, SAMEER SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022 CC 001378 F, APEX ROOFING & RESTORATION LLC VS. UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: OPR-6/30/2022,SIT-6/30/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: ORDER TO PLAINTIFF RE REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS OF SAMEER MOHAMMAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES/TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO RULE 1.310(B)(6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST TO PRODUCE DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT, UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION (PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT, UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION (PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SCHLECHTER, JONATHAN V: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/30/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CC 001378 F

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APEX ROOFING AND RESTORATION LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR HAZLEY, CLARK AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR HAZLEY, DEBBIE is a litigant

Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant