This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 11/27/2020 at 13:35:06 (UTC).

YULEE VILLAS II LTD VS DOYLE, CAYLA Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 YULEE VILLAS II LTD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DOYLE, CAYLA. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POOLE, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POOLE, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YULEE VILLAS II LTD

Defendants

DOYLE, CAYLA

EAKIN, JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATSON, WILLIAM GRANT

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

10/28/2020:COVER SHEET

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED:

10/28/2020:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED:

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED:

10/28/2020:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED:

EVICTION COMPLAINT

10/28/2020:EVICTION COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED: FCAYLA DOYLE

10/29/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED: FCAYLA DOYLE

SUMMONS ISSUED: JOSEPH EAKIN

10/29/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED: JOSEPH EAKIN

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED: AMENDED

11/02/2020:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED: AMENDED

SUMMONS ISSUED:AMENDED CAYLA DOYLE

11/03/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED:AMENDED CAYLA DOYLE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

11/09/2020:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT- JOSEPH EAKIN

11/09/2020:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT- JOSEPH EAKIN

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JOSEPH EAKIN 11/9/20

11/10/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JOSEPH EAKIN 11/9/20

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: CAYLA DOYLE 11/9/20

11/10/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: CAYLA DOYLE 11/9/20

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

11/19/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

DEFAULT: CAYLA DOYLE & JOSEPH EAKIN

11/23/2020:DEFAULT: CAYLA DOYLE & JOSEPH EAKIN

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/24/2020

DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT: CAYLA DOYLE & JOSEPH EAKIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: CAYLA DOYLE 11/9/20

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JOSEPH EAKIN 11/9/20

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT- JOSEPH EAKIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING: COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED:AMENDED CAYLA DOYLE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED: AMENDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: JOSEPH EAKIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: FCAYLA DOYLE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2020

DocketPayment received: $205.00 Receipt Number YX 171451

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2020

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $205.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2020

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2020

DocketCase 452020CC000301CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 10/28/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less