This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 07/23/2021 at 16:35:21 (UTC).

YOUNG, KARISSA VS BRADDOCK, SHARI

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 YOUNG, KARISSA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against BRADDOCK, SHARI. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL, JAMES HUNT, JAMES DANIEL and DANIEL, JAMES H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DANIEL, JAMES HUNT

JAMES DANIEL

DANIEL, JAMES H

 

Party Details

Petitioner

YOUNG, KARISSA

Respondent

BRADDOCK, SHARI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

JAMIESON, STEPHANIE NICOLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/07/2021

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: KARISSA YOUNG 7/7/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SHARI BRADDOCK 7/7/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021

DocketDV CLOSING FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021

DocketMOTION: FOR ENTRY OF A FJ BY CONSENT AND IN LIEU OF PERSONAL APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2021

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SHARI BRADDOCK 6/23/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021

DocketDV TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021

DocketPETITIONERS REQUEST FOR CONFIDENTIAL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021

DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF INJUNCTION PROCEDURES AND COURT DATE & TIME JULY 7, 2021 @ 8:30AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021

DocketCHECKLIST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021

DocketINFORMATION SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021

DocketDV PETITION FOR INJUNCTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021

DocketEvent DV scheduled on 7/7/2021 at 0830 AM, YX - Judge JAMES DANIEL presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021

DocketJudge: DANIEL , JAMES H Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021

DocketCase 452021DR000579DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 6/23/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less