This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/24/2019 at 13:32:07 (UTC).

YOH, MARY Et Al VS PRUITT, LISA

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 YOH, MARY filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against PRUITT, LISA. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

YOH, MARY

YOH, SAMUEL D

Defendant

PRUITT, LISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARDS, MEGHAN ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

07/31/2019:COMPLAINT

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: LISA PRUITT

08/05/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: LISA PRUITT

SUMMONS ISSUED: LISA PRUITT

08/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: LISA PRUITT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

08/07/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

ANSWER: FROM LISA PRUITT

08/15/2019:ANSWER: FROM LISA PRUITT

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: LISA PRUITT 8/8/19

08/19/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: LISA PRUITT 8/8/19

ORDER SETTING HEARING

08/21/2019:ORDER SETTING HEARING

 

Docket Entries

08/21/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2019

DocketEvent TRL scheduled on 8/27/2019 at 0400 PM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2019
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: LISA PRUITT 8/8/19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2019
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER: FROM LISA PRUITT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: LISA PRUITT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: LISA PRUITT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2019

DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number YX 148716

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2019

DocketCase 452019CC000306CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 7/31/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2019

DocketEvent Date: 08/27/2019 16:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: TRL; Location: YX HISTORIC COURTROOM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less