This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 03/15/2022 at 17:48:56 (UTC).

WIEL, ALAN S., WIEL, JAMES F. Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 WIEL, ALAN S , WIEL, JAMES F was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL, JAMES HUNT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL, JAMES HUNT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WIEL, ALAN S.

Decedent

WIEL, JAMES F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MCLEAN, SUZANNE MARIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/10/2022

DocketPayment received: $12.00 Receipt Number YX 193646

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $12.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2022

DocketCompliance PRBLET has been created with due date of 3/7/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2022

DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT-RECORDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2022

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE: ORDER AND LETTERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2022

DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2022

DocketLETTERS OF ANCILLARY ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2022

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2022

DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION AMENDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2022

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE: MISC DOCUMENTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
02/14/2022

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO ESTATE TAX DUE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketNOTICE OF TRUST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketAFFIDAVIT: REGARDING EXECUTION OF FOREIGN WILL AND CODICILS VALID UNDER MICHIGAN LAW **COPY OF WILL ATTACHED**

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketMISCELLANEOUS: EXEMPLIFIED COPY **COPY OF WILL ATTACHED**

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE CARLENE WIEL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE JAMES WIEL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketCase 452022CP000061CPAXYX Filed with Clerk on 2/14/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less