This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/20/2020 at 12:02:13 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS GOSLIN, TABITHA L

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed an Other lawsuit against GOSLIN, TABITHA L. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

GOSLIN, TABITHA L

Yulee, FL 30297-0037

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADAMS, ANSON ANDREW

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

11/22/2019:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/22/2019:COMPLAINT

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

11/22/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TABITHA GOSLIN

11/22/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TABITHA GOSLIN

SUMMONS ISSUED: TABITHA GOSLIN

11/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: TABITHA GOSLIN

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TABITHIA GOSLIN 12/03/2019

12/05/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TABITHIA GOSLIN 12/03/2019

ANSWER: TABITHA GOSLIN

12/27/2019:ANSWER: TABITHA GOSLIN

MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

01/29/2020:MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

01/29/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

01/29/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

01/29/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

03/13/2020:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

06/18/2020:SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

CLOSING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

06/22/2020:CLOSING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

06/22/2020:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

ORDER ADMIN REMOVING FILE FROM ACTIVE DOCKET

06/22/2020:ORDER ADMIN REMOVING FILE FROM ACTIVE DOCKET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to INACTIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ADMIN REMOVING FILE FROM ACTIVE DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLOSING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/20/2020 11:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: MOT; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketEvent MOT scheduled on 3/20/2020 at 1100 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TABITHIA GOSLIN 12/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: TABITHA GOSLIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TABITHA GOSLIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 155454

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCase 452019CC000464CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 11/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS , ANSON