This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/12/2022 at 13:36:48 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS ANDREEWILKINS, CABRINA L

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed an Other lawsuit against ANDREEWILKINS, CABRINA L. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

ANDREEWILKINS, CABRINA L

Not Classified By Court

ANDREE, CABRINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NADERPOUR, AMIR

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

07/13/2022:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/13/2022:COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/13/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

07/13/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

07/13/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

07/13/2022:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED: CABRINA L ANDREEWILKNS

07/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: CABRINA L ANDREEWILKNS

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/09/2022:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

 

Docket Entries

08/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: CABRINA L ANDREEWILKNS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2022

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 199522

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2022

DocketCase 452022CC000237CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 7/13/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less