This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/12/2019 at 16:31:07 (UTC).

WATTS, JENNA L VS WATTS, JEREMY D

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 WATTS, JENNA L filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WATTS, JEREMY D. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL, JAMES H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL, JAMES H

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WATTS, JENNA L

Respondent

WATTS, JEREMY D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/07/2019

DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION 08/27/2019 9AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2019

DocketEMAIL: C. WILLIAMS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2019

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JEREMY DAVID WATTS 07/25/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2019

DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: JEREMY WATTS AND MULTIPLE OTHER PARTIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019

DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: JEREMY DAVID WATTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019

DocketCERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019

DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019

DocketMOTION TO SET FINAL HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019

DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT: JENNA LEE WATTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
07/19/2019

DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019

DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019

DocketMARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019

DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019

DocketJudge: DANIEL , JAMES H Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019

DocketCase 452019DR000668DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 7/19/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less