This case was last updated from Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/02/2022 at 14:41:43 (UTC).

WATSON, DONALD Et Al VS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 WATSON, DONALD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY. This case was filed in Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERSON, ERIC C and ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERSON, ERIC C

ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WATSON, DONALD

WATSON, MARGARET

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAITT, WINSTON ALI

Defendant Attorney

INGALLS, CODY GOLDBERG

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

03/04/2022:COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/04/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

03/04/2022:COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/04/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/04/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

03/04/2022:NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

03/04/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

SUMMONS ISSUED: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

03/04/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

NOTICE OF FILING: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PROCESS

03/10/2022:NOTICE OF FILING: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PROCESS

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO; STEPHEN J. DONAGHY 03/10/2022

03/10/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO; STEPHEN J. DONAGHY 03/10/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

03/22/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION: DEFENDANT'S CORP REP 10/20/2022 @ 10 AM

03/29/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION: DEFENDANT'S CORP REP 10/20/2022 @ 10 AM

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/30/2022:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION: DEFENDANT'S CORP REP 10/20/2022 @ 10 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO; STEPHEN J. DONAGHY 03/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number YX 193391

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCase 452022CA000067CAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 3/4/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer INGALLS, CODY GOLDBERG