This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 07/09/2022 at 13:41:23 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC VS DOYLE, JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC filed an Other lawsuit against DOYLE, JOSEPH. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

DOYLE, JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCADIS, RALPH SAM

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

06/09/2022:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/09/2022:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

06/09/2022:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/09/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: JOSEPH DOYLE

06/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: JOSEPH DOYLE

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JOSEPH DOYLE 06/28/2022

07/01/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JOSEPH DOYLE 06/28/2022

 

Docket Entries

07/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JOSEPH DOYLE 06/28/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: JOSEPH DOYLE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 197874

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2022

DocketCase 452022CC000189CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 6/9/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less