This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 11/29/2021 at 12:08:10 (UTC).

VANSICKLE-HADDOCK, AMY VS HADDOCK, GLENN ERIC

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 VANSICKLE-HADDOCK, AMY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HADDOCK, GLENN ERIC. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BASS, LESTER BERNARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BASS, LESTER BERNARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VANSICKLE-HADDOCK, AMY

Respondent

HADDOCK, GLENN ERIC

Not Classified By Court

VANSICKLE, AMY SUAZNNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROGERS, CHANDA LEIGH

Respondent Attorney

ERLINGER, JENNIFER MICHELE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/12/2021

DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2021

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING: 12/6/21 10AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2021

DocketMOTION: TO PERMIT MINOR CHILD TO TESTIFY IN CAMERA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2021

DocketMOTION FOR CONTEMPT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2021

DocketRESPONSE: FORMER WIFE'S TO FORMER HUSBAND'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE CLOSING FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2021

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2021

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE: FORMER WIFE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2021

DocketCase Status set to REOPENED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2021

DocketReopened for REOPEN OTHER on 9/3/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2021

DocketMOTION TO SET ASIDE FORMER HUSBAND'S CLOSING FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MSARRIAGE AS TO CHILD RELATED ISSUES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
03/19/2021

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: GLENN HADDOCK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE AMY VANSICKLE-HADDOCK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketUCCJ AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT: AMY VANSICKLE HADDOCK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketCase 452021DR000287DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 3/19/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less