This case was last updated from Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/26/2021 at 07:50:12 (UTC).

VALLEY NATIONAL BANK VS CLOCK TRANS CORP. Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 VALLEY NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CLOCK TRANS CORP. This case was filed in Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL and FAHLGREN, STEVEN M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL

FAHLGREN, STEVEN M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALLEY NATIONAL BANK

Defendants

ZARYCKY, OLGA L

CLOCK TRANS CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVER, SCOTT H

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

04/28/2021:COVER SHEET

CLOSING FOREIGN JUDGMENT:

04/28/2021:CLOSING FOREIGN JUDGMENT:

FOREIGN JUDGMENT AFFIDAVIT- REC

04/28/2021:FOREIGN JUDGMENT AFFIDAVIT- REC

NOTICE OF: FOREIGN JUDGMENT OLGA ZARYCKY - GUTTENBERG NJ

04/29/2021:NOTICE OF: FOREIGN JUDGMENT OLGA ZARYCKY - GUTTENBERG NJ

NOTICE OF: FOREIGN JUDGMENTOLGA ZARYCKY - FERNANDINA BEACH FL

04/29/2021:NOTICE OF: FOREIGN JUDGMENTOLGA ZARYCKY - FERNANDINA BEACH FL

NOTICE OF: FOREIGN JUDGMENT CLOCK TRANS CORP

04/29/2021:NOTICE OF: FOREIGN JUDGMENT CLOCK TRANS CORP

CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK: SCOTT SILVER. ESQ.

05/04/2021:CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK: SCOTT SILVER. ESQ.

REGISTERED MAIL RECEIPT

05/07/2021:REGISTERED MAIL RECEIPT

REGISTERED MAIL SIGNED DELIVERED: OLGA ZARYCKY,- FERNANDINA BEACH FL, CLOCK TRANS CORP, OLGA ZARYCKY - GUTTENBERG NJ

05/17/2021:REGISTERED MAIL SIGNED DELIVERED: OLGA ZARYCKY,- FERNANDINA BEACH FL, CLOCK TRANS CORP, OLGA ZARYCKY - GUTTENBERG NJ

CERTIFICATE:OF CLERK

06/03/2021:CERTIFICATE:OF CLERK

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE:OF CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREGISTERED MAIL SIGNED DELIVER (NO SIGNED DATE) CLOCK TRANS CORP, (5/10/21) OLGA ZARYCKY - GUTTENBERG NJ, 5/12/21 OLGA ZARYCKY - FDNA BCH, FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $32.10 Receipt Number YX 180469

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREGISTERED MAIL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK: SCOTT SILVER. ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $32.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF: FOREIGN JUDGMENT CLOCK TRANS CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF: FOREIGN JUDGMENTOLGA ZARYCKY - FERNANDINA BEACH FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF: FOREIGN JUDGMENT OLGA ZARYCKY - GUTTENBERG NJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFOREIGN JUDGMENT AFFIDAVIT- REC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLOSING FOREIGN JUDGMENT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $442.00 Receipt Number YX 179639

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $442.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCase 452021CA000128CAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 4/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Valley National Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Silver, Scott H