This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 10/17/2019 at 15:34:39 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT VS LANGFORD, CAROL T Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LANGFORD, CAROL T. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT

Defendants

LANGFORD, CAROL T

LANGFORD, MICHAEL DEAN

Not Classified By Court

TRUSSEL, NANCY CAROL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHMITT, KYLE LEIGH

 

Court Documents

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED MICHAEL LANGFORD

09/23/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED MICHAEL LANGFORD

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED CAROL LANGFORD

09/23/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED CAROL LANGFORD

COVER SHEET

09/23/2019:COVER SHEET

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/25/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: MICHAEL LANGFORD

09/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: MICHAEL LANGFORD

SUMMONS ISSUED: CAROL LANGFORD

09/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: CAROL LANGFORD

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: CAROL LANGFORD 10/7/19

10/15/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: CAROL LANGFORD 10/7/19

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MICHAEL DEAN LANGFORD 10/7/19

10/16/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MICHAEL DEAN LANGFORD 10/7/19

 

Docket Entries

10/16/2019
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MICHAEL DEAN LANGFORD 10/7/19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2019
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: CAROL LANGFORD 10/7/19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: CAROL LANGFORD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: MICHAEL LANGFORD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2019

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 11/26/2019 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2019

DocketPayment received: $320.00 Receipt Number YX 151807

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED CAROL LANGFORD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED MICHAEL LANGFORD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2019

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $320.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2019

DocketCase 452019SC000459SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/23/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2019

DocketEvent Date: 11/26/2019 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2019

DocketEvent Date: 11/26/2019 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less