This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/17/2019 at 15:35:21 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR LLC VS BOONE, SUSAN G

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 UNIFUND CCR LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BOONE, SUSAN G. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nassau County Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR LLC

Defendant

BOONE, SUSAN G

Yulee, FL 32097-5673

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, JEFFREY LEE

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SUSAN BOONE 10/10/19

10/14/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SUSAN BOONE 10/10/19

SUMMONS ISSUED: SUSAN BOONE

09/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: SUSAN BOONE

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/23/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

09/23/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

COVER SHEET

09/23/2019:COVER SHEET

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/23/2019:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SUSAN BOONE 10/10/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED: SUSAN BOONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Event PRE scheduled on 11/26/2019 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 151895

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Case 452019SC000468SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Event Date: 11/26/2019 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIFUND CCR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAHN, JEFFREY LEE