This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 06/08/2022 at 15:41:58 (UTC).

UHG I LLC VS BROOTEN, PAMELA

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 UHG I LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BROOTEN, PAMELA. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UHG I LLC

Defendant

BROOTEN, PAMELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

05/09/2022:COVER SHEET

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/09/2022:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/09/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: PAMELA BROOTEN 6/21/22 9AM

05/11/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: PAMELA BROOTEN 6/21/22 9AM

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: PAMELA BROOTEN

06/02/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: PAMELA BROOTEN

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 06/21/2022 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: PAMELA BROOTEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 6/21/2022 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: PAMELA BROOTEN 6/21/22 9AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 196467

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCase 452022SC000253SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 5/9/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UHG I LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL