This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 09/02/2019 at 13:30:57 (UTC).

TUPELO PLANTATION OWNERS ASSOC VS SATYAL, RUBY Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/09/2019 TUPELO PLANTATION OWNERS ASSOC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SATYAL, RUBY. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POOLE, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POOLE, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TUPELO PLANTATION OWNERS ASSOC

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

WEINTRAUB, BARRY

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

SATYAL, RUBY

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARRY WEINTR

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

08/09/2019:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

08/09/2019:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

08/09/2019:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BARRY WEINTRAUB

08/09/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BARRY WEINTRAUB

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED RUBY SATYAL

08/09/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED RUBY SATYAL

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #1

08/09/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #1

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #2

08/09/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #2

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARRY WEINTRAUB

08/09/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARRY WEINTRAUB

SUMMONS ISSUED: BARRY WEINTRAUB

08/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: BARRY WEINTRAUB

SUMMONS ISSUED: RUBY SATYAL

08/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: RUBY SATYAL

SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT #1

08/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT #1

SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT #2

08/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT #2

SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARRY WEINTRAUB

08/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARRY WEINTRAUB

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/12/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/13/2019:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/13/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARRY WEINTRAUB

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT #2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT #1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: RUBY SATYAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: BARRY WEINTRAUB

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2019

DocketPayment received: $450.00 Receipt Number YX 149073

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARRY WEINTRAUB

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED RUBY SATYAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BARRY WEINTRAUB

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2019

DocketCase 452019CC000310CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/9/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less