This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 06/21/2019 at 13:30:34 (UTC).

TROUILLE, STEVIE D VS NELSON, TAYNA

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 TROUILLE, STEVIE D filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against NELSON, TAYNA. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POOLE, WESLEY R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POOLE, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TROUILLE, STEVIE D

Defendant

NELSON, TAYNA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

05/28/2019:COMPLAINT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

05/28/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED: TAYNA NELSON

05/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: TAYNA NELSON

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING:

05/28/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING:

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TAYNA NELSON 05/30/2019

06/03/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TAYNA NELSON 05/30/2019

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT: TAYNA NELSON

06/07/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT: TAYNA NELSON

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

06/07/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

FINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

06/14/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

WRIT OF POSSESSION

06/14/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION

 

Docket Entries

06/14/2019

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2019
View Court Documents

DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2019
View Court Documents

DocketFINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT: TAYNA NELSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2019
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TAYNA NELSON 05/30/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: TAYNA NELSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2019

DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number YX 144407

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2019

DocketCase 452019CC000209CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 5/28/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less