This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/21/2020 at 13:37:56 (UTC).

TROCINO, FRANK P, TROCINO, MARGRIT A Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 TROCINO, FRANK P, TROCINO, MARGRIT A was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL, JAMES HUNT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL, JAMES HUNT

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

TRONCINO, FRANK P

TROCINO, FRANK P

Guardian Ad Litem

TROCINO, MARGRIT A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

DRAKE, KRISTEN DABBS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/10/2020

DocketDUE DATE CALCULATOR REPORT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2020

DocketCompliance ANNACCT updated due date to 7/1/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2020

DocketCompliance ANNACCT updated due date to 7/1/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2020

DocketCompliance ANNPLAN updated due date to 6/29/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2020

DocketCompliance ANNACCT has been created with due date of 6/7/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2020

DocketCompliance ANNPLAN has been created with due date of 6/7/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2020

DocketCompliance INTINV has been created with due date of 5/8/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2020

DocketCompliance INTPLAN has been created with due date of 5/8/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2020

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2020

DocketORDER APPOINTING PLENARY GUARDIAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2020

DocketLETTERS OF PLENARY GUARDIANSHIP PERSON AND PROPERT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2020

DocketPayment received: $9.00 Receipt Number YX 161865

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2020

DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $9.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2020

DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2020

DocketAPPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2020

DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number YX 159254

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2020

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2020

DocketPETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2020

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2020

DocketCase 452020GA000005GAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 1/28/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less