This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 03/21/2019 at 21:10:38 (UTC).

TIFTON NASSAU LLC VS BASS, JOHN

Case Summary

On 06/28/2018 TIFTON NASSAU LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BASS, JOHN. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POOLE, WESLEY R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POOLE, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIFTON NASSAU LLC

Defendant

BASS, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERS, ROBERT LOUIS

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

06/28/2018:COVER SHEET

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED:JOHN BASS

06/28/2018:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED:JOHN BASS

EVICTION COMPLAINT COUNT 1 & 2

06/28/2018:EVICTION COMPLAINT COUNT 1 & 2

SUMMONS ISSUED: JOHN BASS

07/03/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED: JOHN BASS

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JOHN BASS 070918

07/10/2018:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JOHN BASS 070918

MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

07/17/2018:MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

07/17/2018:DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

RESPONSE: J BASS

07/17/2018:RESPONSE: J BASS

CLERKS DEFAULT:

07/18/2018:CLERKS DEFAULT:

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

07/19/2018:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

FINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

07/20/2018:FINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

WRIT OF POSSESSION

07/23/2018:WRIT OF POSSESSION

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ALL IN POSSESION 072518

07/26/2018:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ALL IN POSSESION 072518

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/26/2018
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ALL IN POSSESION 072518

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2018
View Court Documents

DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2018

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2018
View Court Documents

DocketFINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2018
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCLERKS DEFAULT:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2018
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE: J BASS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2018
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2018
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JOHN BASS 070918

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2018
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: JOHN BASS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2018

DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number YX 126442

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2018

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION COMPLAINT COUNT 1 & 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED:JOHN BASS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2018

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2018

DocketCase 452018CC000225CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 6/28/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less