This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 03/16/2022 at 16:40:14 (UTC).

THOMPSON, ELIZABETH M VS THOMPSON, JAMES N

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 THOMPSON, ELIZABETH M filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against THOMPSON, JAMES N. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BASS, LESTER BERNARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BASS, LESTER BERNARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THOMPSON, ELIZABETH M

Respondent

THOMPSON, JAMES N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GARDNER, DARIN CARR

Respondent Attorney

BULGER, DUSTIN PATRICK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/10/2022

DocketORDER: WIFE'S VERIFIED EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF AND REQUETS FOR EXPEDITED HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketANSWER: TO WIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND RELATED RELIEF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL: CYDNEY T. BULGER, ESQ. AND DUSTIN P. BULGER, ESQ.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2022

DocketEXHIBIT(S): WIFE'S 8

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2022

DocketEXHIBIT(S): WIFE'S 7

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2022

DocketEXHIBIT(S): WIFE'S 6

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2022

DocketEXHIBIT(S): WIFE'S 5

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2022

DocketEXHIBIT(S): WIFE'S 4

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2022

DocketEXHIBIT(S): WIFE'S 3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
02/14/2022

DocketWIFE'S MOTION: FOR VOCATIONAL EVALUATION OF HUSBAND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketWIFE'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE: DARIN C. GARNER, ESQ.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketCase 452022DR000131DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 2/14/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less