This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 02/23/2022 at 13:34:30 (UTC).

THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY VS JAX CITY QUALITY PAINTING LLC

Case Summary

On 01/24/2022 THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against JAX CITY QUALITY PAINTING LLC. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY

Defendant

JAX CITY QUALITY PAINTING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOBLOVE, RICHARD PAUL

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

01/24/2022:COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/24/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

01/24/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED: JAX CITY QUALITY PAINTING LLC

01/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: JAX CITY QUALITY PAINTING LLC

 

Docket Entries

01/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: JAX CITY QUALITY PAINTING LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2022

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 191632

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2022

DocketCase 452022CC000019CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 1/24/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less