Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/20/2019 at 15:30:42 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. VS KOSS, CINDY M

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KOSS, CINDY M. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nassau County Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

KOSS, CINDY M

Fernandina Beach, FL 32034-9133

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVRAR, FLYNN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED: CINDY KOSS

09/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: CINDY KOSS

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED CINDY KOSS

09/27/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED CINDY KOSS

NOTICE:

09/27/2019:NOTICE:

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

09/27/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

09/27/2019:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/27/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/27/2019:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED: CINDY KOSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Event PRE scheduled on 12/3/2019 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 152030

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED CINDY KOSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Case 452019SC000475SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Event Date: 12/03/2019 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LaVrar, Flynn, ESQ.