This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/20/2020 at 15:07:05 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. VS GROLEAU, JOHN M

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GROLEAU, JOHN M. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POOLE, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POOLE, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

GROLEAU, JOHN M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONTERO, ANDRES

 

Court Documents

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/27/2019:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/27/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

12/27/2019:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

12/27/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

NOTICE: OF LEAD ATTORNEY 91596

12/27/2019:NOTICE: OF LEAD ATTORNEY 91596

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/27/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: JOHN GROLEAU

12/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: JOHN GROLEAU

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: JOHN GROLEAU

02/03/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: JOHN GROLEAU

 

Docket Entries

02/03/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: JOHN GROLEAU

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/31/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: JOHN GROLEAU

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2019

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 157405

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE: OF LEAD ATTORNEY 91596

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2019

DocketCase 452019SC000663SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 12/27/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less