This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 12/15/2020 at 15:34:22 (UTC).

TD AUTO FINANCE LLC VS KIM, SOON H

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 TD AUTO FINANCE LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KIM, SOON H. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD AUTO FINANCE LLC

Defendant

KIM, SOON H

Not Classified By Court

KIM, SOON HWA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCADIS, RALPH SAM

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

11/16/2020:COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/16/2020:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

11/16/2020:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: SOON H KIM 2/2/21 9AM

11/18/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED: SOON H KIM 2/2/21 9AM

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/16/2020:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

11/16/2020:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: SOON H. KIM

12/01/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: SOON H. KIM

 

Docket Entries

02/02/2021

HearingEvent Date: 02/02/2021 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX Grand; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: SOON H. KIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: SOON H KIM 2/2/21 9AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2020

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 2/2/2021 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2020

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 172310

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2020

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2020

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2020

DocketCase 452020SC000909SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 11/16/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less