This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 09/21/2019 at 13:30:58 (UTC).

TAYLOR, ANGELICA N VS LYLE, ANGELICA

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 TAYLOR, ANGELICA N filed an Other lawsuit against LYLE, ANGELICA. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAYLOR, ANGELICA N

Defendant

LYLE, GLYNDA

Not Classified By Court

TAYLOR, GLYNDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LE MIEUX, JAMES RICHARD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

08/28/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED GLYNDA LYLE

08/28/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED GLYNDA LYLE

ATTORNEY CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCE

08/28/2019:ATTORNEY CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCE

COMPLAINT

08/29/2019:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED: GLYNDA LYLE

09/09/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: GLYNDA LYLE

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS

08/29/2019:APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS

SIGNED APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS

09/09/2019:SIGNED APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS

CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCE

09/09/2019:CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCE

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: GLYNDA LYLE 9/11/19

09/13/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: GLYNDA LYLE 9/11/19

EMERGENCY TEMPORARY INJECTION AND ORDER SETTING HEARING

09/18/2019:EMERGENCY TEMPORARY INJECTION AND ORDER SETTING HEARING

 

Docket Entries

09/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEMERGENCY TEMPORARY INJECTION AND ORDER SETTING HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2019

DocketEvent MOT scheduled on 9/24/2019 at 1100 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2019
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: GLYNDA LYLE 9/11/19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSIGNED APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: GLYNDA LYLE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2019
View Court Documents

DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED GLYNDA LYLE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketATTORNEY CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2019

DocketCase 452019CC000334CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/28/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2019

DocketEvent Date: 09/24/2019 11:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: MOT; Location: YX HISTORIC COURTROOM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less