This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 11/29/2021 at 13:50:06 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS TRINIDAD, MANUEL

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TRINIDAD, MANUEL. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM and JENNY BARRETT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

JENNY BARRETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

TRINIDAD, MANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

07/01/2021:COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/01/2021:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

07/01/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/01/2021:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

07/01/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED: MANUEL TRINIDAD

07/26/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: MANUEL TRINIDAD

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

07/27/2021:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

EFILED ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/11/2021:EFILED ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED: MANUEL TRINIDAD 01/25/2022 @ 9AM

10/14/2021:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED: MANUEL TRINIDAD 01/25/2022 @ 9AM

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MANUEL TRINIDAD 11/1/2021

11/02/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MANUEL TRINIDAD 11/1/2021

ANSWER:MANUEL TRINIDAD

11/12/2021:ANSWER:MANUEL TRINIDAD

 

Docket Entries

01/25/2022

HearingEvent Date: 01/25/2022 09:00; Judge: BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER:MANUEL TRINIDAD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MANUEL TRINIDAD 11/1/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2021

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 1/25/2022 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY BARRETT presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED: MANUEL TRINIDAD 01/25/2022 @ 9AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2021

DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number YX 187457

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2021

HearingEvent Date: 10/12/2021 09:00; Judge: BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2021

DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2021

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: MANUEL TRINIDAD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
07/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: MANUEL TRINIDAD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 182956

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021

DocketCase 452021SC000427SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 7/1/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less