This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/17/2022 at 06:10:17 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS NICHOLSON, PENNY

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NICHOLSON, PENNY. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JENNY BARRETT, HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JENNY BARRETT

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

NICHOLSON, PENNY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

Defendant Attorney

STEELE, ANDREW CREIGH

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

09/17/2021:COVER SHEET

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/17/2021:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/17/2021:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/17/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: PENNY NICHOLSON 1/4/22 @9AM

09/21/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: PENNY NICHOLSON 1/4/22 @9AM

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: PENNY NICHOLSON 12/14/21

12/17/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: PENNY NICHOLSON 12/14/21

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

12/30/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL- RECORD

02/18/2022:CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL- RECORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL- RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/04/2022 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: Steele, Andrew C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: PENNY NICHOLSON 12/14/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: PENNY NICHOLSON 1/4/22 @9AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 1/4/2022 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY BARRETT presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 186484

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCase 452021SC000614SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEELE ANDREW C