This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/17/2022 at 05:53:54 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS DAEHNE, SUSAN

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAEHNE, SUSAN. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM, HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY and JENNY BARRETT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

JENNY BARRETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

DAEHNE, SUSAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

08/04/2021:COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/04/2021:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

08/04/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/04/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: SUSAN DAEHNE

08/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: SUSAN DAEHNE

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/30/2021:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/04/2021:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SUSAN DAEHNE 9/10/21

09/24/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SUSAN DAEHNE 9/10/21

DEFAULT: SUSAN DAEHNE

11/16/2021:DEFAULT: SUSAN DAEHNE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/16/2021 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT: SUSAN DAEHNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 11/16/2021 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY BARRETT presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SUSAN DAEHNE 9/10/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: SUSAN DAEHNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 184261

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCase 452021SC000494SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/4/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J