This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/16/2022 at 14:24:40 (UTC).

STRUENSE, HOLLY FRANCES VS STRUENSE, BRIAN KEITH

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 STRUENSE, HOLLY FRANCES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STRUENSE, BRIAN KEITH. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL and FAHLGREN, STEVEN M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL

FAHLGREN, STEVEN M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STRUENSE, HOLLY FRANCES

Respondent

STRUENSE, BRIAN KEITH

Not Classified By Court

BLATT, HOLLY FRANCES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEMAIL: CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION: OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE: HOLLY FRANCES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL- RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 11/18/21 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEMAIL: REFERRED TO FMU

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketJudge: FAHLGREN , STEVEN M Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE: BRIAN STRUENSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE: HOLLY STRUENSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT: HOLLY STRUENSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER: HOLLY STRUENSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCase 452021DR000745DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less