This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 12/07/2022 at 16:46:35 (UTC).

STOUSE, JACQUELINE M. VS STOUSE, KEVIN F.

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 STOUSE, JACQUELINE M filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against STOUSE, KEVIN F. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LESTER BASS, BASS, LESTER BERNARD and BASS, LESTER B. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LESTER BASS

BASS, LESTER BERNARD

BASS, LESTER B

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STOUSE, JACQUELINE M.

Respondent

STOUSE, KEVIN F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COLSON, REBECCA JETT

Respondent Attorney

MILLER, CHAUNTEL L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JAQUELINE STOUSE 11/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JAQUELINE STOUSE 11/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDV AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE: CHAUNTEL L. MILLER, ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDV EXTENDED TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 12/8/2022 at 0830 AM, YX - Judge LESTER BASS presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: KEVIN STOUSE 11/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDV TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF INJUNCTION PROCEDURES AND COURT DATE & TIME 11/21/22 830AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDV PETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCHECKLIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketJudge: BASS , LESTER B Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCase 452022DR000956DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 11/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less