This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/16/2022 at 14:25:26 (UTC).

STOUSE, JACQUELINE M. VS STOUSE, KEVIN F.

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 STOUSE, JACQUELINE M filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STOUSE, KEVIN F. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BASS, LESTER BERNARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BASS, LESTER BERNARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STOUSE, JACQUELINE M.

Respondent

STOUSE, KEVIN F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COLSON, REBECCA JETT

Respondent Attorney

CLARK, JOHN JOSEPH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING: 06/08/22/ 09:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketEXPEDITED MOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND ENFORCEMENT OF STANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION: GRAHAM PACKAGING COMPANY, L.P., C/O REGISTERED AGENT CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER'S THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketHUSBAND'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT: KEVIN STOUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER'S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketHUSBAND'S RESPONSE: TO WIFE'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketRETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number YX 184307

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketMARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCase 452021DR000733DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/5/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clark, John Joseph