This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 06/07/2019 at 13:31:52 (UTC).

ST. JOHNS PROPERTIES VS MCLAUGHLIN, DEBORAH C.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 ST JOHNS PROPERTIES filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against MCLAUGHLIN, DEBORAH C. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POOLE, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POOLE, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ST. JOHNS PROPERTIES

Defendant

MCLAUGHLIN, DEBORAH C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERS, KYLE

 

Court Documents

EVICTION COMPLAINT

05/15/2019:EVICTION COMPLAINT

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED:

05/15/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED:

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

05/15/2019:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED: DEBORAH C MCLAUGHLIN

05/16/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: DEBORAH C MCLAUGHLIN

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING:

05/22/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING:

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: DEBORAH C MCLAUGHLIN 05/21/2019

05/24/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: DEBORAH C MCLAUGHLIN 05/21/2019

 

Docket Entries

05/24/2019
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: DEBORAH C MCLAUGHLIN 05/21/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: DEBORAH C MCLAUGHLIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2019

DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number YX 143823

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2019

DocketCase 452019CC000198CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 5/15/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less