This case was last updated from Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/08/2022 at 14:33:59 (UTC).

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC VS JOHNSON, REBECCA Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JOHNSON, REBECCA. This case was filed in Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERSON, ERIC C, ERIC ROBERSON and ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE

ROBERSON, ERIC C

ERIC ROBERSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

JOHNSON, REBECCA

THE OAKS AT BRISTOL HOMEOWNERS

JOHNSON, TRAVIS

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 1

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 2

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MCCABE, MICHAEL JOHN

 

Court Documents

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/06/2022:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

06/06/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

PROOF OF SERVICE

05/26/2022:PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE

05/26/2022:PROOF OF SERVICE

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/16/2022:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

NOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

05/09/2022:NOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT/OWNERS 1

05/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT/OWNERS 1

SUMMONS ISSUED: TRAVIS JOHNSON

05/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: TRAVIS JOHNSON

SUMMONS ISSUED: THE OAKS AT BRISTOL HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

05/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: THE OAKS AT BRISTOL HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

SUMMONS ISSUED: REBECCA JOHNSON

05/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: REBECCA JOHNSON

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/09/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/09/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/09/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/09/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/09/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

05/09/2022:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

05/09/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT

05/09/2022:COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 06/27/2022 09:30; Judge: ROBERSON, ERIC C; Docket Type: CMC; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE; Defendant Attorney: McCabe, Michael John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT/OWNERS 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: TRAVIS JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: THE OAKS AT BRISTOL HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $947.50 Receipt Number YX 196368

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $947.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCase 452022CA000142CAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 5/9/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCABE MICHAEL J