This case was last updated from Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/20/2022 at 14:46:52 (UTC).

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC VS HERON ISLES OWNERS ASSOCIATION Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HERON ISLES OWNERS ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE, ROBERSON, ERIC C and ERIC ROBERSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE

ROBERSON, ERIC C

ERIC ROBERSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

HERON ISLES OWNERS ASSOCIATION

PARRETT, ED

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ED PARRETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS, SARA BETH

Defendant Attorney

MARTIN, JOSHUA KENNETH

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

10/18/2022:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ANSWER: DEFENDANT HERON ISLES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

10/11/2022:ANSWER: DEFENDANT HERON ISLES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

10/03/2022:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

NOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

09/22/2022:NOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC- UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION 2

09/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC- UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION 2

SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ED PARRETT A/K/A EDWIN W. PARRETT

09/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ED PARRETT A/K/A EDWIN W. PARRETT

SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC- UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

09/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC- UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC-HERON ISLES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

09/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC-HERON ISLES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC- ED PARRETT A/K/A EDWIN W. PARRETT

09/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC- ED PARRETT A/K/A EDWIN W. PARRETT

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

09/21/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

09/21/2022:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

NOTICE OF FILING: CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

09/21/2022:NOTICE OF FILING: CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/21/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/21/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/21/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/21/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/21/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/21/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/28/2022 09:30; Judge: ROBERSON, ERIC C; Docket Type: CMC; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE; Defendant Attorney: MARTIN, JOSHUA K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER: DEFENDANT HERON ISLES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC- UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ED PARRETT A/K/A EDWIN W. PARRETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC- UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC-HERON ISLES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC- ED PARRETT A/K/A EDWIN W. PARRETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $955.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCase 452022CA000305CAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less