This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/17/2022 at 05:50:14 (UTC).

SNAP-ON CREDIT LLC VS WILLIAM BURCROFF JR

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 SNAP-ON CREDIT LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILLIAM BURCROFF JR. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY BARRETT and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

JENNY BARRETT

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SNAP-ON CREDIT LLC

Defendant

WILLIAM BURCROFF JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPINOZZA, KEVIN JOHN

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

08/12/2021:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

08/12/2021:COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

08/12/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/12/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

08/12/2021:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

08/12/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/12/2021:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: WILLIAM BURCROFF JR 11/16/21 @ 9AM

08/19/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: WILLIAM BURCROFF JR 11/16/21 @ 9AM

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/23/2021:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: WILLIAM BURCROFF JR 9/18/21

09/27/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: WILLIAM BURCROFF JR 9/18/21

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/16/2021 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: WILLIAM BURCROFF JR 9/18/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 11/16/2021 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY BARRETT presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: WILLIAM BURCROFF JR 11/16/21 @ 9AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 184837

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCase 452021SC000508SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SNAP-ON CREDIT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin