This case was last updated from Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/10/2022 at 14:37:58 (UTC).

SMITH, GENEVA Et Al VS BAILEY, JAMES S Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 SMITH, GENEVA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BAILEY, JAMES S. This case was filed in Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE and ROBERSON, ERIC C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE

ROBERSON, ERIC C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SMITH, ROLAND

SMITH, GENEVA

Defendants

HILLIARD, CUYLER WALTER

HILLIARD, THERESA

BAILEY, JAMES S

DOLES, ROSALEE

CLOUGH, ISABELLA HILLIARD

HILLIARD, THOMAS B

HILLIARD BAILEY, MARGARET ELIZ

HILLIARD, CICERO A

HILLIARD, RHONDIA VICTORIA

HILLIARD, CUYLER W

HILLIARD, ROBERT LEE

HILLIARD, LESTER S

HILLIARD MCDONALD, ANNIE H

HILLIARD, EDWARD SILAS

Not Classified By Court

HILLIARD, CUYLER W.

HILLIARD, THERESA HARGRAVES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERNARD, LAWRENCE JAY

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

02/09/2022:COVER SHEET

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

02/09/2022:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

COMPLAINT

02/09/2022:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

02/09/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

MOTION: FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITENAND GUARIAN AD LITEM

02/10/2022:MOTION: FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITENAND GUARIAN AD LITEM

ORDER APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

02/11/2022:ORDER APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

MISCELLANEOUS: REPORT OF ATTORNEY, GUARDIAN AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

02/25/2022:MISCELLANEOUS: REPORT OF ATTORNEY, GUARDIAN AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

AMENDED COMPLAINT

02/25/2022:AMENDED COMPLAINT

MOTION: FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM

02/25/2022:MOTION: FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM

ORDER: FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM

03/01/2022:ORDER: FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION: FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANEOUS: REPORT OF ATTORNEY, GUARDIAN AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION: FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITENAND GUARIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $422.50 Receipt Number YX 192275

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $422.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCase 452022CA000042CAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 2/9/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bernard, Lawrence Jay