This case was last updated from Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/05/2022 at 14:36:10 (UTC).

SELENE FINANCE LP VS SCHAEDEL, EDWARD J J Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2022 SELENE FINANCE LP filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SCHAEDEL, EDWARD J J. This case was filed in Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ERIC ROBERSON, ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE and ROBERSON, ERIC C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ERIC ROBERSON

ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE

ROBERSON, ERIC C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SELENE FINANCE LP

Defendants

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BE

SCHAEDEL, EDWARD J J

SCHAEDEL, MARGARET M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MARGARET M. SCHAEDEL 02/24/2022

03/02/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MARGARET M. SCHAEDEL 02/24/2022

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: EDWARD J. SCHAEDEL JR 02/24/22

03/02/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: EDWARD J. SCHAEDEL JR 02/24/22

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: USA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT 02/14/2022

03/02/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: USA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT 02/14/2022

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MARGARET M. SCHAEDEL 02/24/2022

02/28/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MARGARET M. SCHAEDEL 02/24/2022

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: EDWARD J. SCHAEDEL JR 02/24/2022

02/28/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: EDWARD J. SCHAEDEL JR 02/24/2022

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

02/15/2022:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

NOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

02/03/2022:NOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS ISSUED: EDWARD J. SCHAEDEL JR

02/03/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: EDWARD J. SCHAEDEL JR

SUMMONS ISSUED: MARGARET M. SCHAEDEL

02/03/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: MARGARET M. SCHAEDEL

SUMMONS ISSUED: USA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

02/03/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: USA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

02/03/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/03/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/03/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/03/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

02/03/2022:COMPLAINT

NOTICE: SUBMITTING CERTIFICATION

02/03/2022:NOTICE: SUBMITTING CERTIFICATION

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

02/03/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

02/03/2022:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 05/02/2022 09:30; Judge: ROBERSON, ERIC C; Docket Type: CMC; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MARGARET M. SCHAEDEL 02/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: EDWARD J. SCHAEDEL JR 02/24/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: USA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT 02/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MARGARET M. SCHAEDEL 02/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: EDWARD J. SCHAEDEL JR 02/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketEvent CMC scheduled on 5/2/2022 at 0930 AM, YX - Judge ERIC ROBERSON presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketEvent CMC scheduled on 3/28/2022 at 0930 AM, YX - Judge ERIC ROBERSON presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE: SUBMITTING CERTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $935.00 Receipt Number YX 192016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $935.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketCase 452022CA000036CAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 2/3/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SELENE FINANCE, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan