This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 12/07/2022 at 16:39:36 (UTC).

SANCHEZ, MICHAEL G VS SANCHEZ, IRENE K

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 SANCHEZ, MICHAEL G filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SANCHEZ, IRENE K. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANCHEZ, MICHAEL G

Respondent

SANCHEZ, IRENE K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROGERS, CHANDA LEIGH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: IRENE K. SANCHEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number YX 206363

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY CHANDA L. RODGERS 01/13/2023, 01/27/2023, 02/20/2023 THROUGH 02/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE: CHANDA L. RODGERS; AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED IRENE K. SANCHEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketMARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCase 452022DR001028DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 12/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROGERS, CHANDA LEIGH