This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 03/16/2022 at 15:45:46 (UTC).

RTO HOLDINGS VS CARRIGG, DAVID

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 RTO HOLDINGS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARRIGG, DAVID. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY, HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE and JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RTO HOLDINGS

Defendant

CARRIGG, DAVID

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

02/14/2022:COVER SHEET

REPLEVIN COMPLAINT

02/14/2022:REPLEVIN COMPLAINT

PROOF OF CLAIM

02/14/2022:PROOF OF CLAIM

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

02/14/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

AUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER DARREN CHAMBERS

02/14/2022:AUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER DARREN CHAMBERS

AUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER ANGEL BOYD

02/14/2022:AUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER ANGEL BOYD

NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

02/14/2022:NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

02/14/2022:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

02/15/2022:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: DAVID CARRIGG 2/16/22

02/18/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: DAVID CARRIGG 2/16/22

 

Docket Entries

03/22/2022

HearingEvent Date: 03/22/2022 10:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: OTSC; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: DAVID CARRIGG 2/16/22

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2022

DocketEvent OTSC scheduled on 3/22/2022 at 1000 AM, YX - Judge JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 3/22/22 @ 10AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER ANGEL BOYD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER DARREN CHAMBERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREPLEVIN COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketPayment received: $395.00 Receipt Number YX 192477

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $385.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketCase 452022SC000110SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 2/14/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less