This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 03/20/2019 at 19:59:59 (UTC).

RPM WOOD PRODUCTIS INC VS GIBSON, MARTY

Case Summary

On 11/13/2012 RPM WOOD PRODUCTIS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GIBSON, MARTY. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R, WILLIAMS, ROBERT E, POOLE, WESLEY R. and GRANVILLE BURGESS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WILLIAMS, ROBERT E

POOLE, WESLEY R.

GRANVILLE BURGESS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RPM WOOD PRODUCTIS INC

Defendant

GIBSON, MARTY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/19/2013

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2013

DocketCLOSING ORDER DISMISSING CASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2013

DocketNOTICE OF PROPOSED DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2013

DocketJudge: POOLE , WESLEY R. Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2012

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: M GIBSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2012

DocketEvent SCM scheduled on 12/19/2012 at 0930 AM, YX - Judge GRANVILLE BURGESS presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2012

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: M GIBSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2012

DocketPLAINTIFFS WRITTEN STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2012

DocketSTATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2012

DocketNOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2012

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2012

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 7188

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2012

DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $175.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2012

DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2012

DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2012

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2012

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2012

DocketCase 452012SC000343SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2012

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2012

DocketEvent Date: 12/19/2012 09:30; Judge: WILLIAMS, ROBERT E; Docket Type: SCM; Location: YX COURTROOM A; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less