This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/21/2019 at 16:31:25 (UTC).

REAMS, ALLYSEN N VS REAMS, SCOTT D

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 REAMS, ALLYSEN N filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against REAMS, SCOTT D. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL, JAMES H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert M. Foster Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL, JAMES H

 

Party Details

Petitioner

REAMS, ALLYSEN N

Respondent

REAMS, SCOTT D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FALTEMIER, VALERIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION: N REAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT: ALLYSEN N REAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED: SCOTT DAVID REAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Payment received: $418.00 Receipt Number YX 152041

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • MARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • UCCJ AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Case 452019DR000887DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FALTEMIER, VALERIE