This case was last updated from Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/22/2022 at 14:40:04 (UTC).

QUANT STAFFINGS LLC VS JOHNS, DONNA M

Case Summary

On 08/23/2022 QUANT STAFFINGS LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JOHNS, DONNA M. This case was filed in Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE and ROBERSON, ERIC C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE

ROBERSON, ERIC C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUANT STAFFINGS LLC

Defendants

JOHNS, DONNA M

GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC

CONSECO FINANCE SERVICING CORP

BOMBARDIER CAPITAL INC

JOHNS, DONNA M.

Not Classified By Court and Defendants

CONSECO FINANCE SERVICING CORP

GREEN TREE FINANCIAL SERVICING

GREENPOINT CREDIT CORP

SECURITY PACIFIC HOUSING SERVI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVENS, RONALD WESLEY

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

08/23/2022:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

08/23/2022:COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

08/23/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

08/23/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/23/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/23/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/23/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/23/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/23/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/23/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: BOMBARDIER CAPITAL INC CT CORPORATION SYSTEM

08/23/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: BOMBARDIER CAPITAL INC CT CORPORATION SYSTEM

SUMMONS ISSUED: CONSECO FINANCE SERVICING GROUP

08/23/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: CONSECO FINANCE SERVICING GROUP

SUMMONS ISSUED: DONNA M. JOHNS

08/23/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: DONNA M. JOHNS

SUMMONS ISSUED: DONNA M. JOHNS

08/23/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: DONNA M. JOHNS

SUMMONS ISSUED: CONSECO FINANCE SERVICING CORP

08/23/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: CONSECO FINANCE SERVICING CORP

SUMMONS ISSUED: GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC

08/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: DONNA M. JOHNS 08/30/22

08/31/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: DONNA M. JOHNS 08/30/22

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: DONNA M. JOHNS 08/30/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: CONSECO FINANCE SERVICING CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: DONNA M. JOHNS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: DONNA M. JOHNS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: CONSECO FINANCE SERVICING CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: BOMBARDIER CAPITAL INC CT CORPORATION SYSTEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $460.00 Receipt Number YX 201502

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $460.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketCase 452022CA000268CAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Green Tree Financial Servicing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GREENPOINT CREDIT CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where BOMBARDIER CAPITAL INC. is a litigant