This case was last updated from Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/17/2022 at 14:42:53 (UTC).

POTTS, SARAH F. VS ESTATE OF LEMUEL C. PEEPLES, S Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2022 POTTS, SARAH F filed an Other lawsuit against ESTATE OF LEMUEL C PEEPLES, S. This case was filed in Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERSON, ERIC C and ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERSON, ERIC C

ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POTTS, SARAH F.

Defendants

ESTATE OF LEMUEL C. PEEPLES, S

PEEPLES, ROBERT E.

PEEPLES, ELIZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBS, ARTHUR IVAN

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

02/18/2022:COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/18/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/18/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/18/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

02/18/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED: ESTATE OF LEMUEL C. PEEPLES, SR

02/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: ESTATE OF LEMUEL C. PEEPLES, SR

SUMMONS ISSUED: ROBERT E. PEEPLES

02/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: ROBERT E. PEEPLES

SUMMONS ISSUED: ELIZA PEEPLES

02/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: ELIZA PEEPLES

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ROBERT PEEPLES 02/28/2022

03/01/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ROBERT PEEPLES 02/28/2022

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: HERBERT E. PEEPLES 02/28/2022

03/01/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: HERBERT E. PEEPLES 02/28/2022

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ELIZA PEEPLES 02/28/2022

03/01/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ELIZA PEEPLES 02/28/2022

RESPONSE: DEFENDANT-ROBERT E. PEEPLES

03/02/2022:RESPONSE: DEFENDANT-ROBERT E. PEEPLES

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE: DEFENDANT-ROBERT E. PEEPLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ELIZA PEEPLES 02/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: HERBERT E. PEEPLES 02/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ROBERT PEEPLES 02/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: ELIZA PEEPLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: ROBERT E. PEEPLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: ESTATE OF LEMUEL C. PEEPLES, SR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number YX 192723

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCase 452022CA000054CAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 2/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBS, ARTHUR IVAN