This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 11/29/2021 at 13:37:22 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO ROCOVERY ASSOCIATES VS MILLER, SUZANNE R

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 PORTFOLIO ROCOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MILLER, SUZANNE R. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM and JENNY BARRETT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

JENNY BARRETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO ROCOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

MILLER, SUZANNE R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, RACQUEL ANN

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

06/17/2021:COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/17/2021:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/17/2021:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

06/17/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED: SUZANNE MILLER

06/23/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: SUZANNE MILLER

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SUZANNE MILLER 9/4/21

09/08/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SUZANNE MILLER 9/4/21

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SUZANNE MILLER 9/4/21

09/15/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SUZANNE MILLER 9/4/21

 

Docket Entries

09/21/2021

HearingEvent Date: 09/21/2021 09:00; Judge: BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SUZANNE MILLER 9/4/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SUZANNE MILLER 9/4/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: SUZANNE MILLER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 9/21/2021 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY BARRETT presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2021

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 182139

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2021

DocketCase 452021SC000381SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 6/17/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less