This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/17/2022 at 05:28:31 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS WILSON, TIM

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILSON, TIM. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY BARRETT and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

JENNY BARRETT

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

WILSON, TIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DE JESUS, JOHN BACUS

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

08/31/2021:COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/31/2021:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

08/31/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED: TIM WILSON 12/7/21 @9AM

09/01/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: TIM WILSON 12/7/21 @9AM

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/31/2021:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TIM WILSON 11/16/21

11/18/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TIM WILSON 11/16/21

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/07/2021 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TIM WILSON 11/16/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 12/7/2021 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY BARRETT presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: TIM WILSON 12/7/21 @9AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 185605

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCase 452021SC000563SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/31/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE JESUS , JOHN BACUS