This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/17/2022 at 05:35:11 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, VS WILCOX, THURMAN

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILCOX, THURMAN. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE, HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY and JENNY BARRETT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

JENNY BARRETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES,

Defendant

WILCOX, THURMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENBAUM, DAVID MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

08/27/2021:COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/27/2021:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/27/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: THURMAN WILCOX 12/7/21 @9AM

08/31/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: THURMAN WILCOX 12/7/21 @9AM

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/27/2021:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

08/27/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: THURMAN WILCOX 11/16/21

11/18/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: THURMAN WILCOX 11/16/21

MEDIATION ORDER

01/03/2022:MEDIATION ORDER

NOTICE OF MEDIATION 2/17/22 2PM

01/13/2022:NOTICE OF MEDIATION 2/17/22 2PM

OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

02/23/2022:OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

03/10/2022:MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

03/10/2022:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

03/10/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

AFFIDAVIT: OF INDEBTEDNESS

03/10/2022:AFFIDAVIT: OF INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

03/10/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

MISCELLANEOUS: RETURN OF SERVICE COPY DO NOT USE

03/10/2022:MISCELLANEOUS: RETURN OF SERVICE COPY DO NOT USE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANEOUS: RETURN OF SERVICE COPY DO NOT USE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT: OF INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION 2/17/22 2PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/07/2021 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: THURMAN WILCOX 12/7/21 @9AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 185559

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCase 452021SC000552SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greenbaum, David M