This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/20/2020 at 13:22:59 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS TAYLOR, ASHTON

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TAYLOR, ASHTON. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POOLE, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POOLE, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

TAYLOR, ASHTON

Not Classified By Court

RUFFIN, ASHTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERAZA, MANUEL ALEJANDRO

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/12/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/12/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

12/12/2019:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/12/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/12/2019:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

12/12/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED: ASHTON TAYLOR

12/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: ASHTON TAYLOR

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/31/2019:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

12/31/2019:ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: ASHTON TAYLOR 01/24/2020

01/29/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: ASHTON TAYLOR 01/24/2020

 

Docket Entries

01/29/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: ASHTON TAYLOR 01/24/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/31/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/31/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: ASHTON TAYLOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2019

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 156754

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019

DocketCase 452019SC000623SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 12/12/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less